-
Archived from the
original on
August 21, 2021.
Retrieved August 21, 2021.
Visarra,
Chito M. (May 22, 2016). "New
Airport needs runway extension and bay bridge"...
- 1935 – 30
December 1938
Preceded by
Bernardo Josol Succeeded by
Genaro Visarra Governor of
Bohol In
office 16
October 1919 – 15
October 1925 Preceded...
-
Magsaysay Sixto Brillantes Sr.
December 20, 1956 June 20, 1965
Genaro Visarra May 12, 1960
November 10, 1962
Carlos P.
Garcia Cesar Miraflor November...
-
Wayback Machine www.hoteltravel.com
Retrieved November 19, 2006.
Chito M.
Visarra (June 26, 2017). "PAL
starts Daily Flight to Seoul,
South Korea". Bohol...
-
Butalid 1926 – 1931
Presidente Andres Torralba 1931 – 1938
Presidente Genaro Visarra 1939 – 1941 Muni****l
Mayor Honorio Grupo 22 May 1942 – 1945 Muni****l...
- Corella, Cortes, Dauis, Loon, Maribojoc, Panglao,
Tagbilaran 7
Genaro Visarra December 30, 1938
December 30, 1941 2nd
Nacionalista Elected in 1938. District...
-
Group of Publications.
Retrieved 8
August 2016.
Bohol Chronicle,
Chito M.
Visarra (24
April 2016). "PHIVOLCS
warns on
quake due to East fault". Archived...
-
Schools in
Bohol 2nd District".
DepEd Bohol.
Retrieved 21 Oct 2012.
Chito M.
Visarra (December 6, 2016). "Opening Woes SHS's
Limited Subject Offerings". Bohol...
- ****embly 1935–1938 Juan
Torralba 2nd
National ****embly 1938–1941
Genaro Visarra 1st
Commonwealth Congress 1945 1st
Congress 1946–1949 2nd
Congress 1949–1953...
-
Butalid 1926 – 1931
Presidente Andres Torralba 1931 – 1938
Presidente Genaro Visarra 1939 – 1941 Muni****l
Mayor Honorio Grupo 22 May 1942 – 1945 Muni****l...