-
Julijans Vaivods (18
August 1895 in Vārkava, Latgale,
Vitebsk Governorate – 24 May 1990 in Riga,
Soviet Union) was the
Apostolic Administrator of Riga...
- singers:
Kristine Opolais Bishops: Jānis Bulis, Jānis Pujats,
Julijans Vaivods,
Antonijs Springovičs Politicians:
Francis Trasuns,
Yakov Pliner, Ilze...
-
seminary in 1984,
Vialikaselets was
ordained a
priest by
Cardinal Julijans Vaivods and was
directed to his
first parish of the Holy
Trinity in Ishkaldz, Brest...
-
Catholic Church titles Preceded by
Julijans Vaivods Cardinal Priest of
Santi Quattro Coronati 1991–present In****bent Preceded by
Timothy Manning Roman...
- Muni****lity Līvāni Muni****lity Town
rights 1926
Government • Mayor
Andris Vaivods Area • Total 6.37 km2 (2.46 sq mi) • Land 5.80 km2 (2.24 sq mi) • Water...
-
modern bishops have
included Mar
Sebastian Adayantharath and
Julijans Vaivods.
Annuario Pontificio 2013 (Libreria
Editrice Vaticana 2013 ISBN 978-88-209-9070-1)...
-
Records Preceded by
Julijans Vaivods Oldest living Member of the
Sacred College 24 May 1990 – 4
September 1991 Succeeded by
Ferdinando Giuseppe Antonelli...
-
Country Latvia
Formed 1999
Centre Līvāni
Government • Council
Chair Andris Vaivods (LZS) Area • Total 622.57 km2 (240.38 sq mi) • Land 606.51 km2 (234.17 sq mi)...
- may
refer to:
Julian gens,
members of the
Roman patrician family Julians Vaivods (1895–1990),
Latvian cardinal Julians Zagorskis (1903–1978),
Latvian and...
- (1 Oct 1958 – 5 Aug 1960) (Apostolic Administrator)
Cardinal Julijans Vaivods (10 Nov 1964 – 24 May 1990) (Apostolic Administrator)
Bishop Jānis Cakuls...