- Sir
Moses Puibangara Pitakaka GCMG (24
January 1945 – 25
December 2011)
served as the
third Governor-General of the
Solomon Islands from 7 July 1994 until...
-
Bartholomew Ulufa'alu Man****eh
Sogavare Allan Kemakeza Preceded by Sir
Moses Pitakaka Succeeded by Sir
Nathaniel Waena Personal details Born 1955 (age 68–69)...
-
Candidate Party Votes Remesio Eresi 778
Binet Gadebeta 520
Moses Puibangara Pitakaka 506 John
Macdonald 173
Total 2,140
Registered voters 3,353 Source: Election...
- 1973
general election Candidate Party Votes Gideon Zoleveke 690
Franklin Pitakaka 318
Allan Qurusu 263
Binet Gadebeta 192
Benjamin Robinson 81
Peter Qorovuku...
-
November 1994
Monarch Elizabeth II
Governors General George Lepping,
Moses Pitakaka Preceded by
Solomon Mamaloni Succeeded by
Solomon Mamaloni Personal details...
-
George Lepping (1947–2014) 7 July 1988 7 July 1994 6
years 3 Sir
Moses Pitakaka (1945–2011) 7 July 1994 7 July 1999 5
years 4 Sir John
Lapli (born 1955)...
- Governors-general: Sir
Baddeley Devesi, Sir
George Lepping, Sir
Moses Pitakaka, Sir John Lapli, Sir
Nathaniel Waena, Sir
Frank Kabui, Sir
David Vunagi...
-
Harrison 2023–2024: Hon
Tongoua Tabe 2024–(present): Hon
Harrison Ngosu Pitakaka There are
three National Constituencies in Choiseul. However, originally;...
-
Turnquest Governor-General of the
Bahamas 31
March 1995
Moses Puibangara Pitakaka Governor-General of the
Solomon Islands 17 June 1995 Sir
Nicholas Maxted...
-
Islands in the
Western Province and the
present Governor General,
Moses Pitakaka, is from
Choiseul Province. "No. 48474". The
London Gazette (8th supplement)...